Área de identidad
Tipo de entidad
Persona
Forma autorizada del nombre
Leclant, Jean
Forma(s) paralela(s) de nombre
Forma(s) normalizada del nombre, de acuerdo a otras reglas
Otra(s) forma(s) de nombre
Identificadores para instituciones
Área de descripción
Fechas de existencia
1920-2011
Historia
French Egyptologist; he was born in Paris, 8 August 1920, son of René L., a merchant and Laurence Pannier; he studied at the École normale supérieure, 1940-5 and the École pratique des hautes études, 1953; Dr ès lettres, 1963; he was attached to CNRS, 1946-8 and served at IFAO, 1948-52; he directed a mission to Ethiopia, 1952; he became lecturer, 1953-5 and then professor, 1955-63 at the University of Strasbourg; he was appointed Professor of Egyptology at the Sorbonne, 1963-79 and director of studies at the the École pratique des hautes études, 1964-90; he became Professor of Egyptology at the Collège de France, 1979-90; he excavated at Axum, 1952-6; Karnak, Saqqara from 1963-99; Soleb, 1960-78; and Sedeinga from 1979; he produced the annual 'Fouilles et travaux en Égypte et au Soudan' in Orientalia, 1948-2002; editor of the Meroitic Newsletter and Annales d'Éthiopie, 1955-72; Grand Officer of the Légion d'honneur; Member of the Académie des inscriptions et belles-lettres, 3 May 1974 and its secrétaire perpétuel, 24 June 1983; Vice-President of the Société francaise d'égyptologie, 1965; President, 1970-9; he was head of the Advisory Committee on overseas excavations, 1973-88; Vice-President of the French section of UNESCO; his principal publications were Enquêtes sur les sacerdoces et les sanctuaires égyptiens a l'époque dite Ethiopienne (XXe dynastie), 1954; with others, Karnak-nord IV, 1954; In the Steps of the Pharaohs, 1958; Montouemhat, Quatrième Prophète d'Amon, 1961; Recherches sur les monuments thébains de la XXVe dynastie dite ‘éthiopienne’ 1965; with others, Soleb I-II, 1965-71; with J.-P. Lauer, Mission archéologique de Saqqarah I. Le temple haut du complexe funéraire du roi Téti, 1972; with G. Clerc, Inventaire bibliographique des Isiaca, 1972-4; with others, Mission archéologique de Saqqarah II. Le temple haut du complexe funéraire du roi Ounas, 1977; with others, Le temps des pyramides, 1978; Recherches dans la pyramide et au temple haut du Pharaon Pépi Ier à Saqqarah, 1979; with R. Parker and J.-C. Goyon, The Edifice of Taharqa by the Sacred Lake of Karnak, 1979; with others, L'Empire des conquérants, 1979, with others, L'Égypte du crépuscule, 1980; De l'égyptophilie a l'égyptologie, 1985; with H. Fischer, L'écriture et l'art de l'Égypte ancienne. Quatre leçons sur la paléographie et l'épigraphie pharaoniques, 1986; with A. Zivie, Memphis et ses nécropoles au Nouvel Empire, 1988; with J.-P. Lauer and A. Labrousse, L'architecture des pyramides à textes I, Saqqara-Nord, 1996; with M. Rassart-Debergh, Textiles d'Antinoe, 1997; with others, L'expédition d'Égypte, postérités et prospectives, 1998; with D. Valbelle, Le décret de Memphis, bicentenaire de la découverte de la Pierre de Rosette, 1999; Répertoire d'épigraphie méroïtique: corpus des inscriptions publiées, 2000; Au fil du Nil, le parcours d'un égyptologue, 2001; with others, Les textes de la pyramide de Pépy ler I, 2001; Dictionnaire de l'Antiquité, 2005; he died in Paris, 16 September 2011; his library was added to the Champollion Library at the Collège de France, Paris.
Lugares
Estatuto jurídico
Funciones, ocupaciones y actividades
Mandatos/fuentes de autoridad
Estructura/genealogía interna
Contexto general
Área de relaciones
Área de puntos de acceso
Puntos de acceso por materia
Puntos de acceso por lugar
Occupations
Área de control
Identificador de registro de autoridad
Identificador de la institución
Reglas y/o convenciones usadas
Estado de elaboración
Nivel de detalle
Fechas de creación, revisión o eliminación
Idioma(s)
Escritura(s)
Fuentes
- Who Was Who in Egyptology (5th ed. 2019), 268-269 fig. (portrait).